Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Civics Education Award Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Kittleman, Boteler, Buckel, Krebs, McComas, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Civics Education Award Program to award $1,000 to 40 public school students in grade 12 who achieve a score of 90% or higher on the civics portion of the naturalization test administered by the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; requiring by the first day of the 2022-2023 school year, the State Board to determine the means of providing each high school student an opportunity to take the civics test; and requiring the Department of Education to provide funding for the awards program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Civics Education Award Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Civics Education Award Program
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Age
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 2/28/2022 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page