Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Anderton, Frush, and Jalisi
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing waste or recycling collection vehicles to be equipped with or display yellow or amber lights or signal devices; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {578370/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)
(   22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page