Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Expansion of Affordable Housing - County Grants
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins and Charles
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide one-time grants to the three counties with the highest cost of living, to be used to expand affordable housing; and requiring, for fiscal year 2024, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $60,000,000 to the Department, to carry out the Act.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Expansion of Affordable Housing - County Grants
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2022 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page