Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Act - Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer-Employee Relationship
Sponsored by
Delegate Harrison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an employer may overcome the presumption of an employer-employee relationship under the Workplace Fraud Act and establish that a certain individual is acting as an independent contractor on a certain showing.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0806
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Act - Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer-Employee Relationship
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page