Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Anderton, Buckel, Carey, Hornberger, Kipke, Szeliga, Valderrama, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to have a program of physical education for prekindergarten students; adding a representative to the Advisory Council on Health and Physical Education; establishing as a State goal that each student in a public elementary school be provided 150 minutes of developmentally appropriate physical activity each week; requiring the State Department of Education to collect data on the physical activity of elementary school students and publish the information on its website; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1296 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public School Students - Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page