Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate McCaskill
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain employees of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the State Retirement and Pension System to transfer the creditable service of employees transferred into the Correctional Officers' Retirement System under the Act unless the employee elects not to transfer service on or before June 1, 2025; authorizing certain employees to elect not to transfer service; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0972
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703021/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page