Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the application of the prohibition on pharmacy benefits managers reimbursing a pharmacy or pharmacist in an amount less than the pharmacy benefits manager reimburses itself or an affiliate; repealing provisions of law relating to maximum allowable cost pricing, disputes regarding cost pricing, and reimbursement and fee for performance-based reimbursement; altering how a pharmacy benefits manager may determine reimbursement for a pharmacy or pharmacist; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement and Cost Sharing
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page