Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release – Home Detention Monitoring – Alterations and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State to use available federal funds to provide certain payments to private home detention monitoring agencies for certain costs under certain circumstances; requiring the Workgroup on Home Detention Monitoring to submit a report of its recommendations regarding the costs and availability of both publicly and privately provided pre-trial home detention monitoring systems to the General Assembly by December 31 each year; stating the intent of the General Assembly to fund certain requirements using only federal funds; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Conditions of Pretrial Release – Home Detention Monitoring – Alterations and Extension
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513822/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Conditions of Pretrial Release – Home Detention Monitoring – Alterations and Extension
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 6/27/2022 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page