Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service and Grievances - Baltimore City Community College - Faculty
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that full-time faculty members employed by Baltimore City Community College are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System; and allowing certain faculty to participate in a certain grievance procedure.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Professional Service and Grievances - Baltimore City Community College - Faculty
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/12/2022 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page