Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Hubbard, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Cullison, Frush, Holmes, Hucker, Ivey, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stein, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a specified permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas to submit specified information to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene in a specified manner; establishing the Hydraulic Fracturing Chemical Education and Impact Fund for specified purposes; requiring the Department to establish a specified fee by regulation; establishing a specified civil penalty for specified violations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   22-701 through 22-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page