Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on or before December 1, 2022, to develop certain policies and recommendations to require at least 40% of overall spending on certain programs, projects, or investments to benefit certain overburdened communities, starting with fiscal year 2024; defining an "overburdened community" as any census tract where the median house hold income is not more than 75% of the statewide median household income and certain environmental indicators are above the 75th percentile; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1310 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment and Energy - Investment in Overburdened Communities
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Last Updated: 5/4/2022 12:12 PM
Click to return on the top page