Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Bromwell, Buckel, Carey, Clark, Cluster, Fisher, Glass, S. Howard, Malone, McConkey, Morgan, Parrott, Queen, Saab, Simonaire, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets specified requirements except the required certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a specified firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Adopted (30-16)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Adopted (30-16) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page