Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist, from July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2023, inclusive, to administer vaccinations to an individual who is at least 3 years old but under the age of 18 years if certain requirements are met; requiring the Prevention and Health Promotion Administration, in consultation with the State Board of Pharmacy, to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021 certain information the Administration considers relevant to setting policies on the administration of vaccines to children by pharmacists; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0736
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {926281/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-14)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {926281/1 Adopted 26AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (119-14) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 5:24 PM
Click to return on the top page