Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the clerk of the Circuit Court for Washington County from issuing a certain business license under certain circumstances unless the applicant submits to the clerk a certification that the location of the business for which the license is sought has proper zoning; and prohibiting the clerk of the Circuit Court of Washington County from endorsing a change in a place of business in Washington County until certain zoning requirements are met.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1653 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page