Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
Sponsored by
Delegate Pruski
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person who makes an automatic renewal offer to consumers to allow a consumer to cancel the automatic renewal in a certain manner; requiring automatic renewal offers to be displayed in a certain manner and contain certain information; establishing that compliance with certain regulations shall be considered to be compliance with the Act; and establishing that a violation of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-9)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903929/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (126-9) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:17 PM
Click to return on the top page