Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith and Lierman
Status
In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide certain services to certain students of the Baltimore City Public School system and youth workers in the Baltimore City YouthWorks program; prohibiting the Administration from seeking certain fees or reimbursement; and requiring the Administration, Baltimore City Public Schools, and the Mayor's Office of Employment Development to adopt regulations establishing the eligibility criteria for students and youth workers receiving a student transit pass.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Student Transportation - Transit Buses and Carpooling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353726/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Transportation - Student Transportation - Transit Buses and Carpooling
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843527/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {353726/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {353726/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page