Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program Certification Requirements - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, Jacobs, and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring holders of certain retail alcoholic beverages licenses and certain designated employees to complete training in an approved alcohol awareness program; requiring individuals who are employed to sell or serve alcoholic beverages to be certified by an approved alcohol awareness program; requiring holders of retail alcoholic beverages licenses to ensure that an individual who is certified is on the licensed premises during the hours in which alcoholic beverages may be sold or served; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823695/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program Certification Requirements - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {823695/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program Certification Requirements - Alterations
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-102, 10-1901, 11-102, 11-1901, 12-102, 12-1901, 12-1904, 13-102, 13-1901, 14-102, 14-1901, 15-102, 15-1901, 15-1902, 16-102, 16-1901, 17-102, 17-1901, 17-1903, 18-102, 18-1901, 18-1902.1, 19-102, 19-1901, 19-1903, 20-102, 20-1901, 20-1903, 21-102, 21-1901, 22-102, 22-1901, 22-1903, 23-102, 23-1901, 23-1903, 24-102, 24-1901, 24-1903, 25-102, 25-1901, 25-1902, 25-1903, 26-102, 26-1901, 27-102, 27-1901, 28-102, 28-1901, 29-102, 29-1901, 30-102, 30-1901, 31-102, 31-1901, 31-1903, 32-102, 32-1901, 32-1903, 33-102, 33-1901, 33-1903, 4-501, 4-505, 9-102, 9-1901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page