Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller and Adams
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from one-third to one half the maximum portion of a home improvement contract price that a person may receive as a deposit before or at the time of execution of a home improvement contract.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593790/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-17)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Retailers - Home Improvement Contracts
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {593790/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (123-17) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page