Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to require a certain property owner to register certain property with the county in order to offer the property for lease; authorizing the code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to charge a fee for registering certain property with the county and to impose a fine for a dwelling that is not registered with the county; and authorizing code home rule counties of the Southern Maryland class to conduct certain inspections and impose certain fines for certain violations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0832
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690210/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-38)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines
House 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {690210/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-38) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {688576/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Last Updated: 5/7/2021 8:38 AM
Click to return on the top page