Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Bedbug Detection and Treatment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Charles
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a tenant to notify the tenant's landlord if the tenant knows or reasonably suspects the tenant's dwelling unit contains bedbugs; requiring a landlord receiving notice from a tenant to provide for the inspection and, if necessary, treatment of the tenant's dwelling unit and contiguous units; imposing on a tenant certain requirements relating to access to and treatment of the tenant's dwelling unit; prohibiting a landlord from offering a dwelling unit the landlord knows or reasonably suspects to contain bedbugs; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Bedbug Detection and Treatment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Bedbug Detection and Treatment Act
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-1001 through 8-1006 )
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 7:44 PM
Click to return on the top page