Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the On-Farm Composting and Compost Use Grant Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; establishing a solid waste disposal surcharge to be paid, on a quarterly basis beginning April 1, 2023, to the Comptroller by owners or operators of refuse disposal facilities in the State; establishing the Environmental Stewardship Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Comptroller to, on an annual basis, transfer certain solid waste disposal surcharge revenue to certain funds for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-2101 through 2-2103 )
(   9-1701,   9-1707,   9-17A-01 through 9-17A-06, 9-201   )
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page