Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Carr, Korman, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for certain public-private partnerships presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain presolicitation reports to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving a public-private partnership agreement until the Legislative Policy Committee has completed a certain review; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {580819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {913725/1 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {580819/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {913725/1 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10A-101, 10A-201, 10A-203, 10A-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page