Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Anderton, Barkley, Beitzel, Chang, Clippinger, Frick, Hornberger, Jackson, McCray, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Rose, Shoemaker, Waldstreicher, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a State correctional officer for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and providing that the Act applies only prospectively and may not be applied or interpreted to have any effect on or application to any claims arising before October 1, 2017.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page