Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for fiscal year 2017, county boards of education shall be relieved of a specified portion of a contribution for specified local employees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; providing for a specified allocation of payment relief; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in either fiscal year 2018 or 2019 to be paid into specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System if a specified condition is not met; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934664/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {934664/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Text - Chapter - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page