Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the elevated blood lead level that initiates certain case management, environmental investigation, notification, and lead risk reduction requirements; and requiring the Department of the Environment to study and report on the most effective means of incorporating the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Blood Lead Reference Value into the State's lead poisoning prevention programs on or before December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {203025/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text - Chapter - Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention - Elevated Blood Lead Level
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page