Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax – Special Use Assessment of Country Clubs and Golf Courses – Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Acevero
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a special use assessment for property tax purposes for certain country clubs and golf courses; repealing a certain subclass of real property for land of a country club or golf course; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax – Special Use Assessment of Country Clubs and Golf Courses – Repeal
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page