Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Jones, Brooks, Foley, Hill, Patterson, and Proctor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop a voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure envelope; and requiring the Administration to make the voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure envelope available to any individual of driving age who requests one by January 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Driver’s Licenses, Identification Cards, and Registration Plates – Notation for Autism Spectrum
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233023/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Referred Rules 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 9:59 PM
Click to return on the top page