Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Falsely Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett and Charles
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to bring a civil action for damages against another person who knowingly causes a police officer to arrive at a location to contact the person with a certain intent; and establishing an exception in certain cases where a person who alleges to have been a victim of abuse requests the help of a police officer.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0227 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Falsely Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Falsely Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-2301 through 3-2303 )
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:09 AM
Click to return on the top page