Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to post on its website certain reports on the administration and operation of the State's unemployment insurance laws by the first day of each month; establishing that a disaster exists if the Department, for 4 consecutive weeks fails to pay at least 82% of first payments within a certain time period; requiring that the disaster reporting requirements remain in effect until the Department processes at least 87% of first payments during a certain period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0818
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173790/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {173790/1 Adopted 21AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Finance 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {227574/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 50
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page