Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Ebersole, Hill, Lierman, Palakovich Carr, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to include on the Maryland resident individual income tax return form a certain notification concerning the homeowners' property tax credit and a certain separate form that a taxpayer may use to apply for the homeowners' property tax credit; and requiring that certain qualifying homeowners receive the homeowners' property tax credit for subsequent taxable years without being required to file an application for the credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Last Updated: 3/2/2022 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page