Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones PG 303-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones in Prince George's County; authorizing the Workgroup to identify potential areas with a high concentration of off-sale retail licenses as alcohol outlet density zones, and propose as an alcohol outlet density zone any area that has 1.15 off-sale license holders or more per square mile; and requiring the Workgroup to report it recommendations to the Prince George's County House and Senate delegations and to the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of Class A Licenses PG 303-19
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {373696/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – Off–Sale Licenses and Permits PG 303–19
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {284437/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones PG 303-19
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones PG 303-19
(   26-102, 26-1104, 26-1603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page