Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Division of Rehabilitation Services - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation to the Division of Rehabilitation Services in the State Department of Education to ensure the State match amount for the Division is met as required by certain federal acts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0859
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Department of Education - Division of Rehabilitation Services - Funding
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Division of Rehabilitation Services - Funding
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page