Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Ghrist
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum term of imprisonment for the offense of manslaughter by vehicle or vessel from 10 to 20 years, and from 15 to 25 years for an individual who has previously been convicted of certain other driving-related offenses, and the maximum term of imprisonment for the offense of homicide by motor vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or alcohol per se from 5 to 10 years, and from 10 to 15 years for an individual previously convicted of certain other driving-related offenses.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page