Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Technical Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain references to the Comptroller of Maryland to be the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission, as appropriate; and clarifying certain powers and duties of the Executive Director of the Commission relating to alcoholic beverages regulation and enforcement.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2023
Legislative Date
2/10/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2023
Legislative Date
2/10/2023
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2023
Legislative Date
3/18/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
4/07/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/01/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2023
Legislative Date
5/08/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2023 2/10/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2023 2/10/2023 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Technical Corrections and Clarifications
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2023 3/18/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2023 3/11/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Technical Corrections and Clarifications
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2023 3/21/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2023 4/07/2023 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2023 3/26/2023 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2023 3/26/2023 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2023 3/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/01/2023 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2023 5/08/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Technical Corrections and Clarifications
(   1-101,   11-102,   11-1406,   11-206,   11-207,   11-2102,   12-102,   12-403,   1-313,   1-314,   1-404,   1-406,   1-409,   1-410,   15-1001,   15-102,   15-1309,   16-102,   16-405,   19-102,   19-403,   19-404,   20-1009,   20-102,   2-102,   2-103,   2-106,   21-102,   2-111,   2-113,   21-1311,   2-114,   2-115,   2-116,   2-118,   2-119,   2-124,   2-125,   2-130,   2-131,   2-132,   2-132.1,   2-132.2,   2-133,   2-135,   2-136,   2-137,   2-138,   2-139,   2-140,   2-143,   2-145,   2-148,   2-149,   2-151,   2-152,   2-158,   2-164,   2-201,   2-202,   2-203,   2-204,   2-205,   2-206,   2-207,   2-208,   2-209,   2-210,   2-213,   2-219,   2-301,   2-302,   2-303,   2-304,   2-305,   2-306,   2-307,   2-308,   2-308.1,   23-102,   2-312,   23-403,   23-902,   2-401,   2-402,   2-404,   2-405,   2-406,   2-407,   2-408,   24-102,   24-1310,   2-502,   2-506,   25-102,   25-314,   25-405,   30-102,   30-403,   30-404,   3-101,   3-107,   3-108,   31-1007,   31-102,   31-404,   3-201,   3-202 through 3-205,   3-206,   3-207,   32-1001,   32-102,   32-311,   32-312,   32-403,   32-405,   3-301,   3-302 through 3-304,   33-102,   33-309,   33-504,   3-401,   3-402,   3-404,   3-405,   3-406,   3-407,   3-504,   3-601,   3-602,   3-603,   3-604,   3-605,   3-606,   3-701,   3-703,   3-704,   3-802,   3-803,   3-901,   4-108,   4-109,   4-1104,   4-1105,   4-1202,   4-206,   4-505,   5-303,   6-101,   6-103,   6-104,   6-105,   6-107,   6-108,   6-202,   6-203,   6-204,   6-205,   6-308,   6-319,   6-328,   9-102,   9-1403   )
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page