Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Frush, Gutierrez, Jackson, and McKay
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency to report beginning October 1, 2018, and every 2 years thereafter to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention on policies and procedures related to use of force de-escalation training for law enforcement officers; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to adopt procedures for the collection, analysis, and compilation of use of force de-escalation training information received from a certain law enforcement agency; requiring a certain report; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1503 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page