Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Beitzel, Carozza, Chang, Gaines, Ghrist, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Jones, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, McKay, A. Miller, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, and Vogt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, instead of requiring, a certain appointing authority to interview a certain disabled veteran for certain State positions under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374562/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {374562/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Reassigned to Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page