Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit in the Department of State Police; providing for the appointment and salary of a Director of the Unit; requiring the Director to take certain actions; requiring the Unit to perform certain duties; establishing that the offices of the Unit may not be located in Baltimore City; prohibiting the Baltimore Police Department from operating a division that performs the functions of the Unit as described in the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-801 through 3-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page