Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits; requiring the Advisory Council to identify and analyze specified issues affecting couples qualifying for Family Investment Administration benefits and recommend policy changes to help couples navigate the social service systems; requiring the Secretary of Human Resources to submit a report to the General Assembly, no later than January 31, 2018, advising whether the Department will adopt or decline the Council's recommendations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration Benefits
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page