Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Registrations - Notice of Suspension or Revocation
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from suspending or revoking a driver's license or motor vehicle registration before 10 days after the Administration provides specified notice of the suspension or revocation to the licensee or registered owner; requiring a notice of suspension or revocation to be provided in a specified manner and to state specified information with respect to the suspension or revocation of the driver's license or motor vehicle registration; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-705, 16-206, 16-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page