Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study the Impact of Court-Mandated Fines and Fees
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Impact of Court-Mandated Fines and Fees, particularly as it relates to low-income residents and develop a plan and legislative recommendation for eliminating or reducing court-mandated fines and fees; and requiring the Workgroup to report its plan and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0898 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Impact of Court-Mandated Fines and Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Impact of Court-Mandated Fines and Fees
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page