Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Beitzel, Buckel, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Mautz, McComas, McKay, and Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to include oyster repletion projects in a certain database; and requiring the Department to prioritize a supplemental environmental project involving certain oyster repletion projects for a party who is in violation of a certain effluent limitation or unpermitted discharge.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0876
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Water Pollution - Civil Penalty Surcharge - Oyster Repletion Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Water Pollution - Civil Penalty Surcharge - Oyster Repletion Fund
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753225/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Referred Rules 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/06/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text - Chapter - Water Pollution - Oyster Repletion Supplemental Environmental Projects
(   1-306 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page