Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - 2020 Presidential General Election - Report on Use of Mail-in Ballots
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to submit a certain report to the General Assembly regarding the use of mail-in ballots in the 2020 presidential general election on or before July 4, 2021; and requiring the report to include certain information.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elections - 2020 Presidential General Election - Report on Use of Mail-in Ballots
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page