Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Hill, and A. Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Ibogaine Treatment Study Program in the Maryland Department of Health; providing for the purpose of the Program; requiring the Department, on or before July 1, 2019, to select a certain number of academic medical centers to participate in the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget for fiscal years 2020 and 2021 an appropriation of $250,000 for the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-1201 through 8-1205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page