Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rates - Applicability to Sheet Metal Fabricators
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "employee" for purposes of provisions of law relating to the payment of specified prevailing wage rates by specified contractors and subcontractors under specified public works contracts to include specified apprentices and workers who are sheet metal fabricators employed at the place of business of the contractor or subcontractor; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rates - Applicability to Sheet Metal Fabricators
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page