Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board to waive certain distance restrictions under certain circumstances; and authorizing the transfer of a certain Class A alcoholic beverages license from one area of Baltimore City to another area within Baltimore City.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {643421/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Transfer
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:33 PM
Click to return on the top page