Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby and Howard
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Regulating commercial financing transactions, including by establishing requirements related to disclosures, calculations of annual percentage rates, terms of repayments, and other related items, and the extension of special offers; making a violation of the Act an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-610,   12-1101 through 12-1115 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page