Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that a resident of the State meets certain residency requirements for an applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Howard County.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/1/2022 2:01 PM
Click to return on the top page