Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose and contents of and the requirements and qualifications under the Urban Agriculture Grant Fund; requiring nonprofit organizations that receive a grant for purposes of distribution to urban agricultural producers to distribute at least 85% of the grant amount to producers located in low-income census tracts or designated food deserts, of which at least 25% of the grant money is to be distributed to urban agricultural producers in Baltimore City; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223622/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 8:45 PM
Click to return on the top page