Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring parties in certain collective bargaining negotiations for teachers and other personnel in Washington County to make reasonable efforts to conclude negotiations in a timely manner.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-102, 6-408, 6-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page