Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on and after January 1, 2027, a person from disposing of a mattress in a landfill; prohibiting a person from burning or incinerating a mattress as an alternative means of disposal, subject to certain exceptions; requiring certain producers of mattresses sold at retail in the State or a certain representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Mattress Stewardship Program in the Department of the Environment for approval on or before July 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattress Stewardship Program - Establishment
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-1701,   9-1702,   9-1707,   9-1715, 9-1733 through 9-1735 )
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page